Financial history SIR ROBERT HITCHAM'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 310407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.54k £7.57k £8.16k £8.34k £8.59k
Total expenditure £7.50k £6.87k £13.10k £8.46k £8.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A