LEEK TOWN CENTRE YOUTH PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE DROP-IN SESSIONS, IN A SAFE WELCOMING ENVIRONMENT, STAFFED BY TRAINED YOUTH WORKERS, MAINLY FOR LESS-ADVANTAGED AND VULNERABLE YOUNG PEOPLE. ALSO SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION ON SEXUAL HEALTH INCLUDING SAFEGUARDING AND CONTRACEPTION: DRUGS AND SMOKING AWARENESS, HEALTHY EATING. SOCIAL ACTIVITIES EG. GAMES, QUIZZES, POOL, TELEVISION, VIDEO AND MUSIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,401 from 4 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 June 1997: Standard registration
- 23 January 2023: Funds received from 1146708 LEEK STREET PASTORS
- @ 21 MARKET ST LEEK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENNIS JOHNSON | Chair |
|
||||||
Susan Coleman | Trustee | 12 June 2017 |
|
|||||
JANE TATTERSALL | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON DODD | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY MARGARET BIDDULPH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAHFOOZ AHMAD | Trustee |
|
||||||
ROY WILLIAM GREGG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.08k | £26.31k | £38.27k | £52.31k | £41.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.88k | £13.89k | £27.74k | £23.79k | £30.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £750 | £10.00k | £1.09k | £2.67k | £1.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED 3 JUNE 1997
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN LEEK WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 3. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PERSONS RESIDENT IN LEEK AS THE COMMITTEE IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
LEEK
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O 22 WESTFIELDS
LEEK
ST13 5LP
- Phone:
- 01538399908
- Email:
- roygregg@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
at21.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window