Financial history THE HALIFAX ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1069486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £11.58k £3.46k £12.36k £14.42k £18.78k
Total expenditure £9.08k £1.58k £11.43k £13.25k £15.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A