THE HALIFAX ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Halifax Orchestral Society markets itself as the Halifax Symphony Orchestra. The Orchestra gives three concerts per year at Square Chapel, Halifax
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 11 May 1998: Standard registration
- HALIFAX ORCHESTRAL SOCIETY (Working name)
- HALIFAX SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD DAVID FARRAR | Chair | 10 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Margaret Lata | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lesley-Anne Pearson | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heidi Ruth Stevens | Trustee | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Stanley Marshall | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA MARY SLADE | Trustee | 03 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Harry Royston BIGGS | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|||||
MRS HEATHER JEFFERIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.58k | £3.46k | £12.36k | £14.42k | £18.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.08k | £1.58k | £11.43k | £13.25k | £15.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUN 1987 AS AMENDED ON 15 DEC 1997 AS AMENDED ON 10 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY MEANS OF REHEARSALS, LECTURES, THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE SOCIETY THROUGH ITS COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 White Wells Gardens
Scholes
Holmfirth
HD9 1TZ
- Phone:
- 01484683353
- Email:
- contact@halifaxorchestra.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window