PRIORS CHARITY

Charity number: 310541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grants for students of the Chesham Bucks area for education books at university

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024

Total income: £142
Total expenditure: £150

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 April 1972: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PRIOR'S BRITISH SCHOOL CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Cross Chair 03 February 2018
None on record
David Mortimer Trustee 04 December 2021
ARCHBISHOP TENISON'S SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE ASSOCIATION OF GRACE BAPTIST CHURCHES (SOUTH EAST)
Received: On time
GRACE BAPTIST CHARITIES LIMITED
Received: On time
CHESHAM STUDENTS' AND APPRENTICES FUND
Received: On time
Dr Ian Scoones Trustee 04 December 2021
CHESHAM STUDENTS' AND APPRENTICES FUND
Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S COAL FUND
Received: On time
KEVIN PATRICK Trustee
KINGS LANGLEY SCHOOL OUTDOOR EDUCATION CENTRE
Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S COAL FUND
Received: On time
CHESHAM STUDENTS' AND APPRENTICES FUND
Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
PETER ARTHUR WARD Trustee
RACHEL JOHNSON'S COAL FUND
Received: On time
CHESHAM STUDENTS' AND APPRENTICES FUND
Received: On time
RACHEL JOHNSON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £299 £140 £142 £142 £142
Total expenditure £390 £100 £50 £120 £150
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2023 19 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 08 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
59 DARVELL DRIVE
CHESHAM
HP5 2QN
Phone:
01494772247
Website:

No information available