BURBAGE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity holds funds remaining since the sale of the School and building of the Church Extension. The income (mainly interest) is used to maintain the extension.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 01 July 2002: Standard registration
- ST CATHERINES BURBAGE COMMUNITY EXTENSION (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Andrew David Hall | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Clement Morrison | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Neal | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
MR FRANK MEATS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 203 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 March 2022 | 138 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION OF ITEMS, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE SCHOOL. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
BURBAGE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 7
The Leys
Hinckley Road
Burbage
HINCKLEY
LE10 2AJ
- Phone:
- 07891 971273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window