JANE BRADBURY'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to children under 25, Great Chesterford School and new play school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
Governance
- 02 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOUISE JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Samantha hawkins | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Fraser | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE WOODHOUSE | Trustee | 22 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE FENN-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Janet Elizabeth Menell | Trustee |
|
||||||
Paul Richard Charles Gray | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.22k | £2.68k | £2.73k | £3.40k | £7.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52k | £2.63k | £3.22k | £3.11k | £5.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 22ND OCTOBER 1962 AND 17TH NOVENBER 1978
Charitable objects
1. YEARLY PAYMENT TO THE MANAGERS OF GREAT CHESTERFORD CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL. 2. YEARLY PAYMENT TO PROVIDE PRIZES AND SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE SAID SCHOOL AND FOR OTHER MAINTAINED SCHOOLS ATTENDED BY CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LITTLEBURY. (SEE CLAUSE 14 OF THE SCHEME DATED 21ST OCTOBER 1962 FOR DETAILS OF OTHER EDUCATIONAL BENEFITS).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LITTLEBURY
Contact information
- Address:
-
FULFEN HOUSE
AUDLEY END
SAFFRON WALDEN
CB11 4JE
- Phone:
- 01799523066
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window