PLUME EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 310924
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Giving Grants to students attending Plume School, Maldon

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,678
Total expenditure: £10,420

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 July 1963: Standard registration
  • 23 April 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • CHARITIES ADMINISTERED ICW MALDON GRAMMAR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH ELIZABETH DIGNASSE Chair 31 May 2023
None on record
Councillor Kevin Paul Jennings Trustee 10 July 2023
None on record
Susan Mary Swaffin-Smith Trustee 15 June 2023
THE FRIENDS OF THOMAS PLUME'S LIBRARY
Received: On time
THOMAS PLUME'S LIBRARY
Received: On time
COUNCILLOR KERRY-JANE WYLIE Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
Councillor Carlie Ruth Mayes Trustee 15 June 2023
None on record
COUNCILLOR JANE LISA FLEMING Trustee 06 July 2021
None on record
COUNCILLOR NORMA GLADYS FLORENCE SHAUGHNESSY Trustee 15 June 2021
None on record
Cllr. Christopher Swain Trustee 15 June 2021
JOSEPH HENRY UNWIN SICK POOR FUND
Received: On time
CLIVE RICHARD POTTER Trustee 15 June 2021
THOMAS PLUME'S LIBRARY
Received: On time
RICHARD PULESTON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.67k £9.27k £9.59k £10.30k £8.68k
Total expenditure £8.53k £13.42k £12.47k £10.85k £10.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEED DATED 7.9.1920
Charitable objects
A SCHOLARSHIP TO BE HELD IN EACH CASE FOR A PERIOD NOT EXCEEDING FOUR YEARS BY A DESERVING AND SUITABLE GIRL SCHOLAR EDUCATED AT MALDON GRAMMAR SCHOOL IN AID OF THE EXPENSE INCURRED BY SUCH SCHOLAR OR HER PARENTS OR GUARDIANS IN HER FURTHER EDUCATION AT SOME UNIVERSITY OF INSTITUTION FOR HIGHER EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 10 July 1963 : Standard registration
  • 23 April 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Plume School
Fambridge Road
Maldon
Essex
CM9 6AB
Phone:
01621859609
Website:

No information available