Trustees QUEENSWOOD SCHOOL LIMITED
Charity number: 311060
Up to date (66 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES DE SAUSMAREZ BA FCIS | Chair | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Fenn | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Robert Garwood | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Phelan | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chitra Norman | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
The Honourable Nicholas Stamp | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Penny | Trustee | 04 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Belshaw | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
REV David Chapman | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
SIMON MORRIS | Trustee | 20 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Oonagh McGuinness | Trustee | 21 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW POPPLETON | Trustee | 30 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
RALPH BAINES | Trustee | 29 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY CLAUDE GARNHAM BSC | Trustee | 08 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MAY WRINCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.