Financial history THE ARTS EDUCATIONAL SCHOOLS

Charity Number: 311087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.73m £10.36m £11.05m £11.24m £11.19m
Total expenditure £8.95m £10.13m £10.81m £11.33m £11.92m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £66.56k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £253.00k £482.28k £313.47k £220.76k £159.15k
Income - Other trading activities £261.50k £120.38k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £9.18m £9.73m £10.70m £10.92m £10.10m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £42.45k £29.37k £39.92k £94.17k £135.94k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £790.39k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £90.00k £36.10k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.60m £9.83m £10.72m £11.26m £11.87m
Expenditure - Raising funds £352.62k £294.24k £85.94k £75.68k £54.07k
Expenditure - Governance £49.81k £50.54k £104.24k £68.84k £65.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0