Financial history TOWN LANDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 311325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.78k £17.91k £17.85k £20.65k £23.97k
Total expenditure £9.21k £16.31k £16.21k £18.96k £22.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A