THE JESUS COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST

Charity number: 311450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Made grants to Jesus College Boat Club, Cambridge, to encourage fitness training in excellence of rowing

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £64,340
Total expenditure: £44,820

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 November 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir David Hugh Wootton Chair 15 March 1976
CHARLES DICKENS CENTRE (GAD'S HILL) LIMITED
Received: On time
CROSS SECTOR SAFETY AND SECURITY COMMUNICATIONS
Received: On time
THE WOOLMEN'S COMPANY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
BOWYERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LORD MAYOR'S 800TH ANNIVERSARY AWARDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WOOLMEN SUSTAINABILITY START-UP & INNOVATION FUND LIMITED
Received: On time
THE ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL BENEVOLENT AND EDUCATIONAL FUND FOR WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN
Received: On time
THE COMPANY OF WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN OF THE RIVER THAMES POORS FUND
Received: On time
MORDEN COLLEGE
Received: On time
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Rev James Crockford Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Daniel Christopher White Trustee 08 March 2019
None on record
Helen Alice Tromans Trustee 08 March 2016
None on record
MATTHEW IAN JONES Trustee 12 October 2010
None on record
DAVID MILES REID Trustee 12 October 2010
None on record
JONATHAN MICHAEL HUTTON Trustee 12 October 2010
None on record
Sheena Cassidy Hope MA Trustee 10 October 2006
None on record
RICHARD PETER TETT Trustee 15 October 2002
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST HELEN, BISHOPSGATE
Received: On time
RENEW CONFERENCE
Received: On time
EWAN MURRAY GILMOUR PEARSON MA Hons Trustee 13 October 1986
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £60.17k £60.17k £119.03k £62.85k £64.34k
Total expenditure £21.93k £21.93k £118.46k £28.49k £44.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 09 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 09 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 08 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 08 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 04 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BEECH COTTAGE
LONDON ROAD
HARTLEY WINTNEY
HOOK
RG27 8RN
Phone:
07712134636