Financial history COLN RIVER GROUP CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 311518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £251 £256 £263 £266 £268
Total expenditure £197 £78 £540 £70 £564
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A