Trustees ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity number: 311604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jack William Verrall-Kelly Trustee 19 March 2025
None on record
Andrew Spens Trustee 01 January 2024
BRISTOL CCRC TRUST
Received: On time
Jennifer Kate Kittow Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Stephen Miles Brooke Trustee 02 November 2022
None on record
Reverend Canon Daniel Frank Tyndall Trustee 20 May 2013
THE TEMPLE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, REDCLIFFE
Received: On time
CHURCH LANDS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE MAJOR CHURCHES' NETWORK
Recently registered
ST THOMAS ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time
BRISTOL ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY
Received: On time