Financial history THE FOUNDATION OF SAINT MATTHIAS

Charity Number: 311696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £233.85k £222.43k £242.25k £241.55k £241.23k
Total expenditure £336.80k £320.84k £359.77k £391.54k £367.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A