Financial history CLIFTON HIGH SCHOOL

Charity Number: 311736
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.22m £7.98m £9.38m £11.09m £12.53m
Total expenditure £7.98m £7.65m £8.83m £10.80m £12.22m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £62.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £72.00k £95.00k £40.00k £67.00k £65.00k
Income - Other trading activities £77.00k £0 £0 £74.00k £104.00k
Income - Charitable activities £7.78m £7.82m £9.32m £10.92m £12.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.00k £6.00k £7.00k £29.00k £94.00k
Income - Other £272.00k £53.00k £18.00k £5.00k £14.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £7.89m £7.59m £8.72m £10.67m £12.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £85.00k £59.00k £113.00k £130.00k £109.00k
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £16.00k £14.00k £20.00k £17.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £109.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0