PALLISER MARTIN LEGACY RESERVE FUND

Charity number: 311773
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of prizes and awards to students and others for the promotion and encouragement of the knowledge and study of commercial and industrial subjects. These awards are limited to the area covered by the Bristol Chamber of Commerce.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 April 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Cathryn Greenwood Trustee 16 October 2013
BRISTOL INITIATIVE CHARITABLE TRUST 1996
Received: On time
Alison PARSONS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 01 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 23 May 2024 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 09 June 2022 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 23 June 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GWEBUSINESSWEST
LEIGH COURT BUSINESS CENTRE
PILL ROAD
ABBOTS LEIGH
BRISTOL
BS8 3RA
Phone:
01275370875
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available