YEHUDI MENUHIN SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Yehudi Menuhin School provides a specialist education to boys and girls aged 8 to 19 years with an exceptional talent for music and facility on a stringed instrument (violin, viola, cello, double bass, guitar, harp) or piano. Selection for a place at the School is based solely on musical potential and the School aims to offer places regardless of the financial circumstances of the applicant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income:
£5,201,789
Donations and legacies | £745.45k | |
Charitable activities | £3.39m | |
Other trading activities | £654.12k | |
Investments | £412.80k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£5,937,422
Raising funds | £216.86k | |
Charitable activities | £5.38m | |
Other | £343.71k |
£1,009,012 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,196,362 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £560.57k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.38m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £560.57k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.38m | |
Retained for future use | £273.38k |
People

86 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 3 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 November 1971: Standard registration
- 09 April 2001: Removed (Duplicate registration)
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Bruell | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Benedict Vanderspar | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Butcher | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Hilary Cowan | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
David Douglas Buckley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Kathleen Costeloe | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dominic Benthall | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||||
Jonathan Willcocks MA, HonRAM | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|||||||||
LORD BLACKWELL | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
JOHN CLOVIS PAGELLA | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
GEOFFREY RICHARDS | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
ALICE MARY PHILLIPS MA | Trustee | 27 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
Andrew Hunter Johnston | Trustee | 27 June 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45m | £4.78m | £6.43m | £5.10m | £5.20m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.53m | £4.61m | £5.10m | £5.68m | £5.94m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.26m | N/A | £2.04m | N/A | £2.20m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.03m | £977.25k | £2.81m | £994.28k | £745.45k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £76.32k | £425.38k | £555.10k | £689.91k | £654.12k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.07m | £3.06m | £2.85m | £3.12m | £3.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £10.00k | £20.00k | £10.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £262.52k | £253.64k | £226.71k | £301.79k | £412.80k | |
|
Income - Other | £14.55k | £55.24k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £947.50k | £318.56k | £1.72m | £377.02k | £218.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.12m | £4.10m | £4.52m | £5.08m | £5.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £208.60k | £513.02k | £575.46k | £199.05k | £216.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £21.40k | £38.99k | £38.53k | £30.47k | £30.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £49.02k | £50.62k | £48.34k | £49.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £197.70k | £0 | £0 | £397.53k | £343.71k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £13.47m | £9.77m | £13.34m | £13.19m | £12.94m | |
|
Long-term investments | £8.80m | £13.62m | £8.97m | £8.85m | £9.81m | |
|
Other assets | £2.64m | £2.55m | £4.30m | £3.88m | £3.62m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.05m | £906.06k | £984.52k | £937.39k | £1.11m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 11 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 1964 AND AMENDED 5TH AUGUST 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND ADVANCE A GENERAL EDUCATION AND SPECIALISED EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE HIGHEST ORDER IN MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN FROM ANY PART OF THE WORLD WITH TALENTS FOR MUSIC AND THE PERFORMING ARTS AND GENERALLY TO FOSTER MUSIC AND THE ARTS AND GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BY THE PROVISION OF COURSES AT THE SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 25 November 1971 : Standard registration
- 09 April 2001 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Yehudi Menuhin School
Stoke D'Abernon
Cobham
Cobham
Surrey
KT11 3QQ
- Phone:
- 01932864739
- Email:
- bursar@menuhinschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window