AMESBURY SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312058
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Amesbury School's over-arching purpose is the advancement of education through an independent nursery, pre-preparatory and preparatory school for boys and girls between the ages of 2 and 13. This schooling is non-selective at point of entry on grounds of academic standard, race, colour or religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 April 1971: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sandip Vikram Patel Trustee 24 June 2024
None on record
David Edward Gorrod Trustee 05 June 2024
None on record
Pamela Mundy Trustee 24 May 2024
ACS INTERNATIONAL SCHOOLS LIMITED
Received: On time
SUMMER FIELDS' SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Jill Tait-Harris Trustee 22 September 2023
THE ROYAL BALLET SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Received: 5 days late
CRAIG KENNETH DECKER Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
James Robert Welham Trustee 14 October 2022
None on record
Ian Ferguson Trustee 10 June 2022
None on record
Dr rachelle kirkham Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
hugh sturges Trustee 21 February 2022
None on record
Laura Buchanan Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Suzanna Mary Perrett Trustee 20 April 2020
None on record
karen davies Trustee 01 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £4.77m £4.57m £4.42m £4.59m £5.45m
Total expenditure £4.37m £4.42m £4.42m £4.70m £5.23m
Income from government contracts £31.24k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.00k £32.61k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.46k £8.67k £715 £2.60k £12.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £85.70k £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.72m £4.53m £4.40m £4.50m £5.43m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.93k £2.75k £62 £54 £0
Income - Other £39.47k £29.08k £26.15k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.37m £4.42m £4.42m £4.70m £5.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £44.30k £82.39k £0 £19.55k £41.78k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £6.04m £5.89m £5.80m £5.67m £5.62m
Long-term investments £2 £2 £2 £2 £0
Other assets £822.24k £975.04k £921.35k £891.95k £834.54k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £2.02m £1.87m £1.72m £1.68m £1.35m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 16 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 12 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 July 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
AMESBURY SCHOOL
HAZEL GROVE
HINDHEAD
GU26 6BL
Phone:
01428604322