THE EMERSON COLLEGE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 312101

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing adult education courses inspired by the work and philosophy of Rudolf Steiner

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1967: Standard registration
  • 08 April 2019: Funds received from 1143285 INTERNATIONAL SCHOOL OF STORYTELLING
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • EMERSON COLLEGE (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Leach Chair 18 December 2020
None on record
Aonghus Gordon Trustee 10 October 2024
THE HIRAM TRUST
Received: On time
RUSKIN MILL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
CATHERINE GRACE TRUST
Received: On time
WALDORF SCHOOL (BRISTOL) LIMITED
HELIOS TRUST
Received: 33 days late
EURYTHMY UK LTD
Received: On time
RUSKIN MILL CENTRE FOR PRACTICE
Recently registered
Ian Clements Trustee 10 October 2024
CLERVAUX TRUST LTD
Received: On time
RUSKIN MILL CENTRE FOR RESEARCH
Received: On time
THE RESPONSIVE EARTH TRUST
Received: On time
THE HIRAM TRUST
Received: On time
HELIOS TRUST
Received: 33 days late
THE LIVING EARTH LAND TRUST
Received: On time
Tara Gratton Trustee 10 October 2024
CATHERINE GRACE TRUST
Received: On time
WALDORF SCHOOL (BRISTOL) LIMITED
Antonia Whitbread Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Keith Griffiths Trustee 10 October 2024
None on record
Jeremy Smith Trustee 05 December 2022
None on record
Paulamaria Blaxland-De Lange Trustee 03 November 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £1.54m £2.31m £593.27k £1.31m £1.71m
Total expenditure £1.51m £1.27m £787.76k £1.43m £1.71m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.21k £3.34k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £75.79k £266.85k £72.74k £18.91k £0
Income - Other trading activities £545.00k £215.00k £2.50k £477.09k £33.22k
Income - Charitable activities £869.69k £874.64k £448.04k £784.14k £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47 £386 £165 £428 £773
Income - Other £45.76k £956.67k £69.83k £31.97k £645.00k
Income - Legacies £8.68k £0 £0 £2.01k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.05m £0
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.51m £1.27m £787.76k £0 £1.71m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £385.04k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Own use assets £2.26m £2.25m £2.24m £2.28m £2.75m
Long-term investments £0 £12.27k £12.27k £12.27k £12.27k
Other assets £541.03k £1.46m £1.47m £1.37m £766.34k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£828.40k -£781.97k -£708.64k -£635.00k -£830.65k
Total liabilities £388.53k £311.29k £582.07k £714.64k £594.65k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 7 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 August 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 13 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 05 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 05 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Emerson College
Hartfield Road
FOREST ROW
RH18 5JX
Phone:
01342822238