WILLIAM DAVIS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for extra-curricular activities in schools in the benefit area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 10 October 1962: Standard registration
- THE DAVIS TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HENRY WILLIAM DAVIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charles Gould | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Gould | Trustee | 14 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELSPETH MITCHELL | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
SEAN DAVIS | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAY LOUISE BOAG | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Daubeny | Trustee | 26 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNN ELIZABETH MAXWELL | Trustee |
|
||||||
WALTER WILLIAM DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FIONA SAUNDERS WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.69k | £17.88k | £18.66k | £27.74k | £33.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.76k | £13.23k | £19.40k | £1.12k | £35.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 6 FEBRUARY 1953 as amended on 27 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
(A) A SUNDAY SCHOOL, OR CLASSES FOR RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND; (B) EVENING OR OTHER CLASSES FOR INSTRUCTION IN SECULAR SUBJECTS, OR LECTURES OF AN EDUCATIONAL CHARACTER; (C) PHYSICAL INSTRUCTION; (D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF A LIBRARY OR READING ROOM; (E) OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN; CANDIDATES FOR THE BENEFITS MENTIONED ABOVE TO BE POOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGHS OF STEPNEY AND HACKNEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Coglan House
Old Monmouth Road
LONGHOPE
Gloucestershire
GL17 0NZ
- Phone:
- 01452830245
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window