THE RATCLIFF EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 312340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The primary purpose of the Ratcliff Educational Foundation is to support the school currently known as Stepney Greencoat C.E. Primary School. The Charity also aids other educational charities such as the Tower Project - an organisation based in Tower Hamlets that empowers disabled people. If resources allow the Charity also supports other educational acitivities in Tower Hamlets.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £59,856
Total expenditure: £68,109

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Tower Hamlets

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RADCLIFF EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
  • RATCLIFF EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TREVOR FRANCIS CRITCHLOW Chair 01 November 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY
Received: On time
SAMUEL BUTLER'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
The Portal Trust
Received: On time
CHARITY OF MARY BASTOW
Received: On time
THE ST DUNSTAN'S AND ALL SAINTS STEPNEY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
STEPNEY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Alberta Matin Trustee 09 March 2015
None on record
JULIAN CHARLES CASS Trustee 09 March 2015
CHARITY OF MARY BASTOW
Received: On time
THE ST DUNSTAN'S AND ALL SAINTS STEPNEY PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST DUNSTAN AND ALL SAINTS, STEPNEY
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MARY VENABLES Trustee 09 March 2015
STEPNEY CITY FARM
Received: On time
TIM MILLER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £58.36k £56.73k £58.62k £59.48k £59.86k
Total expenditure £33.76k £29.20k £45.30k £72.61k £68.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 April 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 April 2021 156 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LAYER MARNEY TOWER
COLCHESTER
ESSEX
CO5 9US
Phone:
01206330784
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available