THE BURDETT-COUTTS, TOWNSHEND AND ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOLS, WESTMINSTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist and maintain the educational activities of Burdett-Coutts VA Church of England Primary School.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 12 August 1965: Standard registration
- BURDETT-COUTTS AND TOWNSHEND FOUNDATION (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Burdett Money-Coutts | Trustee | 18 August 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Councillor Selina Short | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Karen Joan Partridge-Graves | Trustee | 13 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Alison Seedat | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Jane Evelyn Mumby | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Ms Elizabeth Cooke Szewczyk | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev GRAHAM MARTIN BUCKLE | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||||
ABIGAIL ELIZABETH FARR | Trustee | 23 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.30k | £60.09k | £60.62k | £61.92k | £45.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.68k | £130.11k | £101.19k | £49.93k | £99.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28TH APRIL 1903 AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 23RD FEBRUARY 1905
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF A PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL OR THE MAINTENANCE OF EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT INSTITUTIONS OF SECONDARY OR HIGHER EDUCATION, OR OTHERWISE FOR THE EDUCATIONAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WESTMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
BURDETT COUTTS SCHOOL
ROCHESTER STREET
LONDON
SW1P 2QQ
- Phone:
- 02078286790
- Email:
- office@burdettcoutts.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window