The Portal Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for education to financially disadvantaged young people under 25 years resident in London. Provision of scholarships and bursaries to individuals, and grants to education projects and activities run by schools and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,034,899
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £8.00m | |
Other | £37.50k |
Total expenditure:
£6,575,247
Raising funds | £290.87k | |
Charitable activities | £6.28m | |
Other | £8.00k |
£3,014,746 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £298.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.28m | |
Retained for future use | £1.46m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £298.87k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.28m | |
Retained for future use | £4.47m |
People

9 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 February 1965: Standard registration
- SIR JOHN CASS'S FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Sir John Cass's Foundation (working name) (Previous name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOPHIE ANNE FERNANDES | Chair | 25 January 2012 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Anton Chambers | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Sarwar Zaman | Trustee | 11 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
DENISE JONES | Trustee | 07 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||||||||
Rev TREVOR FRANCIS CRITCHLOW | Trustee | 26 September 2011 |
|
|||||||||||||||
JENNIFER MARY MOSELEY | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
Rev Laura Jane Jorgensen | Trustee | 16 December 2009 |
|
|||||||||||||||
DAVID HOGBEN | Trustee | 24 September 2008 |
|
|
||||||||||||||
HIS HONOUR BRIAN BARKER CBE KC | Trustee | 09 April 2003 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.26m | £7.94m | £7.95m | £7.64m | £8.03m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.63m | £6.07m | £9.91m | £6.48m | £6.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.52k | £209 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.21m | £7.89m | £7.91m | £7.91m | £8.00m | |
|
Income - Other | £39.67k | £46.30k | £40.02k | £40.02k | £37.50k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.44m | £5.88m | £9.63m | £6.22m | £6.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £180.18k | £177.80k | £281.27k | £260.64k | £290.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £121.29k | £144.87k | £110.96k | £124.03k | £135.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £4.86m | £1.36m | £9.02m | £5.62m | £5.55m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £7.79k | £8.01k | £7.87k | £49.52k | £50.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £13.00k | £10.00k | £4.00k | £5.00k | £8.00k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £136.62m | £63.82m | £58.90m | £58.83m | £76.43m | |
|
Long-term investments | £38.40m | £198.16m | £200.78m | £205.27m | £208.43m | |
|
Other assets | £5.78m | £2.58m | £9.15m | £7.52m | £8.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£444.00k | -£193.00k | -£177.00k | -£178.00k | -£171.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £481.33k | £384.28k | £4.06m | £2.41m | £2.01m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 28 APR 1970 AS AMENDED ON 22 OCT 1979 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAR 1992 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUN 1993 AS AMENDED ON 17 DEC 2008 AS AMENDED ON 04 NOV 2010 AS AMENDED ON 27 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED ON 05 DEC 2012 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED ON 22 APR 2015 as amended on 07 Jan 2021 as amended on 14 Jul 2022 as amended on 11 Jul 2024
Charitable objects
THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOLS OF THE TRUST KNOWN AS THE ALDGATE SCHOOL AND STEPNEY ALL SAINTS CHURCH OF ENGLAND SECONDARY SCHOOL. ASSISTANCE TO VOLUNTARY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOLS AND THE LONDON METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY TO APPLY RESIDUE OF THE NET YEARLY INCOME OF THE TRUST IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS:- (A) IN AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES EXHIBITIONS, SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, UNIVERSITY, OR OTHER PLACE OF LEARNING APPROVED BY THE GOVERNORS; (B) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ANY CHURCH OF ENGLAND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION IN THE INNER LONDON EDUCATION AREA HAVING CHARITABLE OBJECTS DIRECTED TO EDUCATING OR IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF BENEFICIARIES BY DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR MORAL CAPACITIES THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES. (C) IN AWARDING SCHOLARSHIPS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION. (D) IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGHS:- CITY OF LDN, ROYAL LDN BOR. OF K'TON AND CHELSEA, LDN BORS.OF CAMDEN,G'WICH,HACKNEY,H'SMITH AND FULHAM, IS'TON,LAMBETH,LEWISHAM,NEWHAM,S'WARK,T-HLETS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Portal Trust
31 JEWRY STREET
LONDON
EC3N 2EY
- Phone:
- 02074805884
- Email:
- hello@portaltrust.org
- Website:
-
portaltrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window