Financial history PALMERS GREEN HIGH SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 312629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £3.48m £3.70m £3.93m £3.85m £4.19m
Total expenditure £3.17m £3.21m £3.39m £3.74m £4.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.13k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £41.21k £18.40k £10.74k £5.02k £1.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £32.59k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.30m £3.64m £3.77m £3.68m £3.95m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £132.41k £40.83k £1.10k £53.83k £114.35k
Income - Other £0 £0 £119.29k £112.52k £120.14k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £10.74k £5.02k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.13m £3.19m £3.36m £3.72m £4.04m
Expenditure - Raising funds £30.67k £27.60k £26.21k £16.49k £23.84k
Expenditure - Governance £18.02k £23.90k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £20.42k £18.81k £8.57k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £6.04k £0