ST PETER'S COLLEGE (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS WESTMINSTER SCHOOL)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Westminster School is a public boarding school for young persons. The aims encompass this object and have been extended over a number of years to accommodate day pupils and girls. It now educates children from 7 through to 18 and aims to widen access as much as possible. It also aims to provide excellence in sporting and extra-curricular activities, notably artistic, musical and social skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£42,535,000
Donations and legacies | £3.43m | |
Charitable activities | £37.49m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.31m | |
Other | £297.00k |
Total expenditure:
£42,611,000
Raising funds | £1.32m | |
Charitable activities | £41.30m | |
Other | £0 |
-£251,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £41.30m |
People

368 Employee(s)
20 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 23 |
£70k to £80k | 47 |
£80k to £90k | 25 |
£90k to £100k | 14 |
£100k to £110k | 4 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£300k to £350k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 08 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Batten | Chair | 27 March 2014 |
|
|||||||
Chris Barrie | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
David Mahoney MBE | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Maria Bentley | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Penelope Kirk | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|||||||
Trevor Bryan Bradley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Claire Marion Oulton | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Grace Yu | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Basi Akpabio | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr Dominic Luckett | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|||||||
Jessica Mary Cecil | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Dr Tristram Julian William Hunt | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|||||||
Nabeel Abdul Mohamed Fazal Bhanji | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sarah Ruth Anderson | Trustee | 25 August 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Edward Balfour Colenutt | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
VERY REVEREND DR DAVID MICHAEL HOYLE | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|||||||
PROFESSOR MARGARET J DALLMAN OBE | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|||||||
E M CARTWRIGHT ESQ | Trustee | 04 December 2014 |
|
|||||||
THE VENERABLE CANON STANTON | Trustee | 05 October 2013 |
|
|||||||
RICHARD NEVILLE-ROLFE MA ESQ | Trustee | 01 December 2005 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.13m | £31.50m | £34.55m | £41.02m | £42.54m | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.06m | £33.71m | £35.93m | £39.35m | £42.61m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £588.00k | £251.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.55m | £1.59m | £1.46m | £5.69m | £3.43m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £119.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £27.58m | £28.54m | £31.58m | £33.81m | £37.49m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £1.72m | £1.18m | £1.46m | £5.60m | £3.38m | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.24m | £1.13m | £1.48m | £1.31m | £1.31m | |
|
Income - Other | £647.00k | £244.00k | £31.00k | £208.00k | £297.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £35.00k | £1.00k | £6.00k | £85.00k | £49.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £30.67m | £32.10m | £34.46m | £38.00m | £41.30m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.39m | £1.61m | £1.47m | £1.36m | £1.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £47.00k | £51.00k | £67.00k | £83.00k | £76.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £34.39m | £37.92m | £41.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £317.00k | £356.00k | £368.00k | £288.00k | £174.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £89.87m | £87.51m | £87.82m | £113.66m | £112.82m | |
|
Long-term investments | £59.41m | £73.20m | £73.16m | £54.44m | £55.31m | |
|
Other assets | £23.60m | £20.00m | £16.60m | £11.96m | £25.10m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£687.00k | £498.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £36.48m | £36.56m | £37.18m | £37.84m | £50.58m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 12 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 22 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHARTER OF ELIZABETH I 1560 AND PUBLIC SCHOOLS ACT 1868 AND STATUTES AND REGULATIONS MADE THEREUNDER. AS AMENDED ON 15TH OCTOBER 1996 as amended by an Order in Council on 29 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
A PUBLIC BOARDING SCHOOL FOR YOUNG PERSONS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ANNIE OWEN PRIZE
- ARNOLD FOSTER MEMORIAL TRUST
- BETHUNE FUND
- BOOK FUND
- CHEYNE FUND
- CHISWICK FUND
- CLIFTON GARDEN FUND
- EASTLAKE FUND
- ELLERSHAW SCHOLARSHIP
- FAULKNER FUND
- GOODENOUGH FUND
- GOW TRUST FUND
- GUMBLETON FUND
- HEADMASTER'S FUND
- HINCHCLIFFE SCHOARSHIPS
- IRELAND FUND
- JONES FUND
- KNAPP FISHER FUND
- LADY LUCY TRUST FUND
- LIBRARY FUND
- MARSHALL FUND
- MARSHALL MEMORIAL FUND
- MASTERS' PENSION AUGMENTATION FUND
- MITCHELL FUND
- MURE CLASSICAL SCHOLARSHIP
- NEALE FUND
- PHILLIMORE I FUND
- PHILLIMORE II FUND
- QUATERCENTENARY APPEAL
- REV DR TRIPLETT'S FOUNDATION
- ROBERTSON FUND
- ROUSE BALL FUND
- SCHOOL EXHIBITIONS FUND
- SOTHERAN TRUST FUND
- STEBBING FUND
- STEVENS FUND
- TOPLADY FUND
- TROUTBECK FUND
- VARLEY BEQUEST
- VINCENT FUND
- WAR MEMORIAL TRUST FUND
- WATERFIELD FUND
- WEBB FUND
- WEEKES SCHOLARSHIP OR EXHIBITION
- WESTMINSTER SCHOOL SOCIETY
- WHITMORE HISTORY PRIZE
- 08 July 1964 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Westminster School
Little Deans Yard
LONDON
SW1P 3PF
- Phone:
- 02079631028
- Email:
- bursar@westminster.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window