ST MARYLEBONE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL

Charity number: 312756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 October 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • GOVERNING BODY OF ST MARYLEBONE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (Working name)
  • TRUSTEES OF ST MARYLEBONE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Frances Smith Endres Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
Mrs B Elise Ormerod Trustee 28 April 2015
MIND IN CAMDEN
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYLEBONE WITH HOLY TRINITY ST MARYLEBONE
Received: On time
CHILDREN'S RADIO FOUNDATION UK LIMITED
Received: On time
THE REVD S J EVANS Trustee 07 April 2011
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYLEBONE WITH HOLY TRINITY ST MARYLEBONE
Received: On time
MR M E ONAH Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARYLEBONE WITH HOLY TRINITY ST MARYLEBONE
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 27 August 2024 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 22 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 11 August 2021 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 10 FEBRUARY 1964
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AN ANNUAL SUMMER OUTING FOR THE POORER CHILDREN OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ST MARYLEBONE
Registration history
  • 21 October 1968 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
ST. MARYLEBONE C OF E SECONDARY
SCHOOL
64 MARYLEBONE HIGH STREET
LONDON
W1U 5BA
Phone:
02079354704
Website:

No information available