Financial history FRIERN BARNET EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 312767
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £56.98k £47.75k £53.22k £63.24k £107.40k
Total expenditure £24.16k £35.09k £29.98k £45.01k £71.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A