Trustees FRIERN BARNET EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 312767

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FRANCES PHILPOTT Chair
None on record
Alison Springett Trustee 14 May 2024
THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF BAKERS
Received: On time
Rev Dagmar Wilkinson Trustee 17 October 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FRIERN BARNET
Received: On time
LAWRENCE CAMPE'S ALMSHOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
Frances Jones Trustee 01 October 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FRIERN BARNET
Received: On time
Stewart Conacher Trustee 01 March 2019
None on record
Suzanne Whittick Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record
GAIL CLEMENS Trustee 01 May 2010
15TH FINCHLEY SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
ANDY BEAL Trustee
None on record
ED NEWMAN Trustee
None on record