Financial history BFWG CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 312903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £176.66k £201.25k £205.26k £256.46k £278.66k
Total expenditure £341.97k £382.31k £350.10k £319.97k £344.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A