HEYTHROP INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Higher Education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 15 September 1971: Standard registration
- HEYTHROP COLLEGE, UNIVERSITY OF LONDON (Working name)
- HEYTHROP COLLEGE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Francis Turner SJ | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||
REV Edward Bermingham SJ | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
REV John Moffat SJ | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
REV DAMIAN HOWARD SJ | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Father Keith Patrick McMillan SJ | Trustee | 01 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25m | £6.30k | £2.71k | £2.09k | £893 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.55m | £6.30k | £2.71k | £2.09k | £893 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.46k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.97m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £285.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.31m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.55m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.30m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 14 June 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 07 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 14TH MAY 1971 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 08 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE LEARNING AND KNOWLEDGE PARTICULARLY IN THE FIELDS OF THEOLOGY AND ALLIED SCIENCES AND IN SUBJECTS WHICH MAY BE CONVENIENTLY AND USEFULLY TAUGHT AND STUDIED THEREWITH OR WHICH MAY CONDUCE TO THE UNDERSTANDING OR STUDY THEREOF AND IN SUCH OTHER SUBJECTS OF OR COGNATE TO EDUCATION AS MAY BE DECIDED UPON FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES (HEREAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE BOARD) AS THE INSTITUTESGOVERNING BODY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Heythrop Institute
114 Mount St
London
W1K 3AH
- Phone:
- 02074990285
- Email:
- Treasurer@jesuit.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window