Financial history ST CHRISTOPHER'S SCHOOL (HAMPSTEAD) LIMITED

Charity number: 312999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £3.87m £3.92m £4.07m £4.60m £5.14m
Total expenditure £3.53m £3.60m £3.97m £4.16m £4.74m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £49.85k £17.63k £23.00k £22.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £19.22k £11.25k £23.83k £13.83k £38.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.69m £3.86m £4.04m £4.53m £4.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.47k £2.45k £1.89k £26.74k £92.64k
Income - Other £153.78k £44.72k £815 £7.96k £45.20k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.53m £3.60m £3.97m £4.16m £4.74m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.00k £17.29k £26.31k £0 £55.35k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0