FRIENDS OF LAMBETH PALACE LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the interests of Lambeth Palace Library by helping in the acquisition of books and manuscripts and in any other suitable way.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lambeth
Governance
- 07 November 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Ann Brookfield | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr MARK STUART BYFORD MA, DPHIL | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LINENTHAL | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.84k | £56.39k | £87.05k | £89.60k | £114.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.28k | £36.95k | £44.41k | £137.34k | £45.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JUNE 1964 AS AMENDED 11 JUNE 1985 10 JUNE 1986 AND 18 JUNE 1987 as amended on 04 Jun 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE INTRESTS OF THE LIBRARY BY ASSISTING IN THE ACQUSITION OF PRINTED BOOKS AND MANUSCRIPTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAMBETH PALACE LIBRARY
15 LAMBETH PALACE ROAD
LONDON
SE1 7JT
- Phone:
- 02078981266
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window