THE OLIVE MATTHEWS COLLECTION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintain and display the Olive Matthews Collection of fashion clothing and accessories at Chertsey Museum, Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8AT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 January 1970: Standard registration
- 13 June 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 13 June 2022: Funds transferred to 1194375 THE OLIVE MATTHEWS COLLECTION
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.79k | £469.59k | £214.18k | £230.54k | £100.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.75k | £217.27k | £312.65k | £206.09k | £210.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 16 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | 16 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DEED OF SETTLEMENT 12/03/1969 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/09/2012 as amended on 21 Apr 2021
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A COLLECTION OF COSTUMES, BRODERIES, BUCKLES, FANS, WATCHES, OTHER FASHION ACCESSORIES, SILVER AND OTHER OBJECTS OF ANTIQUE CRAFTSMANSHIP IN ITS ENTIRETY AND CAUSE IT TO BE KNOWN AS THE OLIVE MATTHEWS COLLECTION AND TO MAKE THE SAME AVAILABLE AUTHORITY, REGIONAL OR NATIONAL MUSEUMS WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window