EXHIBITION OF THE HISTORY OF LEGAL ROBES AND COSTUMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Foundation and maintenance of Exhibition of legal robes and costumes at the Royal Courts of Justice or elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 September 1970: Standard registration
- LEGAL COSTUME EXHIBITION (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dame Nerys Angharad Jefford DBE | Chair | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
ICC Judge Mark Robert Mullen | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON READHEAD KC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THE RT HON. SIR CHRISTOPHER DAVID FLOYD | Trustee |
|
||||||
SIR WILLIAM ANTHONY BLACKBURNE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.04k | £10.02k | £10.03k | £19.55k | £10.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.93k | £28.85k | £17.42k | £12.07k | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1970
Charitable objects
FOUNDATION AND MAINTENANCE OF EXHIBITION OF LEGAL ROBES AND COSTUMES AT THE ROYAL COURTS OF JUSTICE, OR ELSEWHERE.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
ICC Judge Mullen
Royal Courts of Justice
Rolls Building
Fetter Lane
LONDON
EC4A 1NL
- Phone:
- 02079477501
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window