THE INSPIRING FUTURES FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE CAREERS AND HIGHER EDUCATION GUIDANCE TO YOUNG PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 June 1964: Standard registration
- 20 October 2020: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 20 October 2020: Funds transferred to 1092891 THE UK CAREER ACADEMY FOUNDATION
- FUTUREWISE (Working name)
- I S C O (Working name)
- ISCO CAREERSCOPE (Working name)
- INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS CAREERS ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.61m | £1.50m | £18.05k | £15.40k | £168.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.78m | £1.15m | £76.42k | £57.09k | £56.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £19.83k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.56m | £1.48m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £24.31k | £21.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £3.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.58m | £896.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £121.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £210.50k | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £664.65k | £134.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 10 December 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 10 December 2019 | 163 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 12 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 1942 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 20 MARCH 1973, AMENDED 23 NOVEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 2002 AND 4 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AND YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL GUIDANCE AND BY ASSISTANCE TO THEM IN PREPARING FOR A PROFESSION, OCCUPATION OR CALLING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window