THE MAUDSLAY SCHOLARSHIP FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313247
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity provides funds for support of the Maudslay Research Fellowship in engineering at Pembroke College, Cambridge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £25,018
Total expenditure: £15,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 March 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Henry Maudslay CBE Chair
BRITISH MEXICAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
Clive Hickman OBE Trustee 17 February 2025
PALMER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE INSTITUTION OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS
Received: On time
Professor Colm Durkan Trustee 04 July 2023
None on record
Dr David Edgar Eaton Trustee 01 January 2023
KEN HAWLEY COLLECTION TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTH YORKSHIRE TRADES HISTORICAL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
PROFESSOR JAN MARIAN MACIEJOWSKI Trustee 07 February 2018
None on record
Dr Andrew Keith Wyatt Powell OBE Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
LORD SMITH Trustee 12 July 2016
THE SIXTEEN
Received: On time
THE COLLEGE OR HALL OF VALENCE MARY COMMONLY PEMBROKE COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
PROFESSOR DAVID PERRETT Trustee 30 April 2013
GREATER LONDON INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY
Received: On time
HERITAGE ENGINEERING LEARNING TRUST
Recently registered
THE NEWCOMEN SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY
Received: On time
Dr ROGER KINNS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £21.59k £14.51k £21.95k £22.78k £25.02k
Total expenditure £15.00k £15.00k £0 £15.00k £15.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 04 July 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GLENAVON
CLYNDER
HELENSBURGH
G84 0QQ
Phone:
01436831245
Website:

No information available