Financial history THE GEORGE DREXLER FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 313278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £233.96k £248.17k £295.20k £254.48k £278.95k
Total expenditure £316.31k £276.59k £323.58k £341.15k £337.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A