THE CLASSICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the development and maintain the well-being of Classical Studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 February 1964: Standard registration
- 08 October 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sebastian Kokelaar | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Russell Holton | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kim Michael Taylor | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Bell | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sana Tanvir Van Dal | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry Benjamin Cullen | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Judith Margaret Mossman | Trustee | 23 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Ian Keng Liang Goh | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Spencer Anderson | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Anastacia Holding | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Arlene Holmes-Henderson | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Syrithe Pugh | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex McAuley | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HOOKER | Trustee | 11 April 1999 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £490.64k | £495.98k | £463.60k | £466.45k | £491.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £402.49k | £341.32k | £488.33k | £515.58k | £542.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 28 MAY 1904 AS AMENDED 1906, 1908, 1910, 1912, 1914, 1917, 1932, 1935, 1938, 1946, 1956, 1959,1974,1992 , 1993 AND 19 JUNE 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND 13 APRIL 1997. as amended on 23 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT AND MAINTAIN THE WELL-BEING OF CLASSICAL STUDIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 13 February 1964 : Standard registration
- 08 October 2012 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 iMex Centre
575-599 Maxted Road
Hemel Hempstead
Hertfordshire
HP2 7DX
- Phone:
- 07926 632598
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window