Financial history BRITISH DENTAL ASSOCIATION TRUST FUND

Charity number: 313407
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £255.81k £504.41k £812.98k £676.67k £858.66k
Total expenditure £908.96k £858.98k £887.10k £1.01m £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £470.67k £776.82k £641.29k £829.54k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £1.11k £775 £465 £588
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £32.63k £35.39k £34.91k £28.53k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £858.98k £887.10k £1.01m £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £302.29k £332.91k £354.74k £324.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £129.24k £108.92k £28.38k £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0