Financial history THE WINCOTT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 313770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £40.21k £40.50k £54.00k £44.00k £44.01k
Total expenditure £54.24k £44.69k £52.02k £44.62k £45.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A