THE WINSTON CHURCHILL MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Churchill Fellowship, the operating name of the Trust, offers Travelling Fellowships to any British Citizen (over 18 years of age) resident in the UK to go abroad on a worthwhile enterprise of their own choosing. The knowledge, understanding and skills acquired, enriches their own lives and by their example and through the dissemination of knowledge, the UK as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income:
£1,308,271
Donations and legacies | £543.02k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £763.25k | |
Other | £2.00k |
Total expenditure:
£3,044,451
Raising funds | £394.09k | |
Charitable activities | £2.65m | |
Other | £0 |
£109,126 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £394.09k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.65m |
People

15 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 08 February 1965: Standard registration
- The Churchill Fellowship (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE HON JEREMY SOAMES | Chair | 10 December 1998 |
|
|
||||||
SUSAN MARY WOOD | Trustee | 06 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Catherine Smith | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
SIMON BEVAN | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|||||||
Bharatti Crack | Trustee | 16 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Maria Harrison | Trustee | 18 March 2020 |
|
|||||||
James Piran Williams | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|||||||
Lucy Parker | Trustee | 13 September 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Joanne Thompson | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID TAYLOR-SMITH | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50m | £1.32m | £576.64k | £592.39k | £1.31m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.21m | £2.51m | £2.26m | £2.46m | £3.04m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £616.01k | £560.44k | £54.58k | £63.94k | £543.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £876.61k | £759.39k | £522.06k | £528.45k | £763.25k | |
|
Income - Other | £8.06k | £1.36k | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.00k | £2.00k | £20.86k | £36.67k | £5.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.96m | £2.22m | £1.93m | £2.09m | £2.65m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £252.33k | £298.65k | £334.28k | £364.92k | £394.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £64.21k | £87.54k | £107.68k | £125.16k | £140.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £176.75k | £173.38k | £189.27k | £197.74k | £185.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £123.54k | £105.28k | £160.79k | £134.99k | £116.44k | |
|
Long-term investments | £43.94m | £44.18m | £50.27m | £46.44m | £44.62m | |
|
Other assets | £665.16k | £507.28k | £650.51k | £303.32k | £540.10k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £846.07k | £1.68m | £2.24m | £2.27m | £2.29m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28/1/1965, AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 18/12/1979, 12/12/1984, 2/6/1987, 9/12/1992, 8/6/2005 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20/10/1993, ORDER OF THE CHARITY CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20/5/2005. AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 07 DEC 2007 as amended on 16 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROPAGATION OF EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF UNITED KINGDOM CITIZENS FROM ALL WALKS OF LIFE IN SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MANNER THAT SUCH EDUCATION WILL MAKE ITS RECIPIENTS MORE EFFECTIVE IN THEIR LIFE AND WORK, WHILST BENEFITING THEMSELVES AND THEIR COMMUNITIES, AND ULTIMATELY THE UNITED KINGDOM AS A WHOLE. THE INCORPORATED TRUSTEE MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CHURCHILL FELLOWSHIP
CHURCH HOUSE
29 GREAT SMITH STREET
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02077991660
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window