Financial history THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE BAR-ILAN UNIVERSITY

Charity number: 314139
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £583.46k £783.38k £707.38k £747.75k £986.75k
Total expenditure £679.62k £517.09k £872.47k £800.83k £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.40k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £535.01k £767.98k £496.59k £747.75k £986.75k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £48.45k £15.40k £210.79k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £675.22k £511.91k £871.19k £793.43k £1.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.40k £5.18k £1.29k £7.40k £5.76k
Expenditure - Governance £190.55k £220.14k £6.09k £154.15k £111.12k
Expenditure - Grants institution £484.67k £291.77k £698.40k £639.28k £899.26k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0