THE H J HEINZ COMPANY LIMITED CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Program Areas: Youth & Education Local Communities Quality of Life Healthy Children & Families:
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 January 1983: Standard registration
- 22 May 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 May 2024: Funds transferred to 1102510 MAGIC BREAKFAST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17 | £39 | £21.33k | £10.46k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £5.58k | £0 | £11.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2023 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 February 2023 | 459 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 March 2022 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
1. RELIEF OF POVERTY OR SICKNESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY SUCH MEANS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCREATION DETERMINE. 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME TO THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND INCLUDING THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN LIKE MANNER DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window