SEEDS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Artistic workshops and performances in churches, schools and prisons to develop the creativity of participants and audiences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 06 January 1983: Standard registration
- 11 December 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- SEEDS (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £642 | £305 | £305 | £619 | £198 | |
|
Total expenditure | £305 | £0 | £93 | £1.17k | £93 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE MAINTAIN IMPROVE AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIANRELIGION PARTICULARLY BY THE PROPAGATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL THROUGH ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND TO FORMULATE PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THERFOR. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window