THE GORDON RUSSELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the trust is to preserve 'The Archive Collection' at the Gordon Russell Design Museum for the benefit of those interested in the history of 20th century furniture design, including students, researchers and the general public, whilst continuing to develop an educational role and links with schools and colleges offering design related courses and seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 November 1983: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Trumper | Trustee | 17 February 2025 |
|
|||||
David Russell | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Keevil | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Nicholas Duxbury | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Guy Lambert | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Gibbs | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Russell | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.70k | £90.45k | £80.41k | £79.97k | £85.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £93.48k | £87.66k | £78.35k | £93.22k | £90.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £46.87k | £29.16k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 OCTOBER 1983 as amended on 26 May 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY ACQUIRING AND PRESERVING THE COLLECTION OF FURNITURE, CRAFTS MANUSCRIPTS, BOOKS, PAPERS, JOURNALS AND OTHER DOCUMENTS MADE BY THE LATE SIR SYDNEY GORDON RUSSELL AND LADY CONSTANCE ELIZABETH JANE VERE RUSSELL AND THAT SOME OR ALL OF THE TRUST CHATTELS ARE LISTED IN THE SECOND SCHEDULE AND TO DISPLAY OR TO ARRANGE FOR THE DISPLAY TO THE PUBLIC OF SUCH ITEMS AS ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES OF HISTORIC SCIENTIFIC OR ARTISTIC IMPORTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gordon Russell Design Museum
15 Russell Square
High Street
BROADWAY
WR12 7AP
- Phone:
- 01386 854695
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window