THE ARMY RECORDS SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Army Records Society is to edit and publish manuscripts relating to the Army and to reprint works of military interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

24 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 January 1984: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
24 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR TIM BOWMAN | Chair | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Antony Jack Ward | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fionnuala Walsh | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Crowley | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Alan Jeffreys | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Andrew Johnston | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Kate Meyer | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Francis Boff | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Glyn Prysor | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Aimee Elizabeth Fox | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tarak Karim Barkawi | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Nicholas Innes-Robbins | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Stephen Robert Conway | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Helen Parr | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Ismini Pells | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Alexander Wilson | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Perry | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sir Alistair Irwin | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr David French | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Derek Andrew Blair | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Huw Bennett | Trustee | 06 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Butler | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ian Beckett | Trustee | 18 November 2015 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JOHN GOOCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.20k | £14.36k | £14.81k | £14.51k | £14.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.05k | £41.20k | £4.28k | £35.82k | £9.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 09 August 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 DECEMBER 1983, AMENDED 21 NOVEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
FIRST, THE EDITING AND PUBLICATION OF MANUSCRIPTS ILLUSTRATING THE HISTORY, ADMINISTRATION OR SOCIAL LIFE OF THE ARMY; SECOND, THE REPRINTING OF RARE OR GENERALLY INACCESSIBLE WORKS OF MILITARY INTEREST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
87a High Street
The Old Town
Hemel Hempstead
Hertfordshire
HP1 3AH
- Phone:
- 01442 220150
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window