Financial history TELEVISION FOR THE ENVIRONMENT

Charity number: 326585
Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £275.59k £109.26k £94.94k £66.42k £95.03k
Total expenditure £329.37k £135.90k £72.16k £65.99k £90.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A