THE CARNEGIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326595
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objective of the trust is to raise and provide funds for the provision of sailing and other recreational facilities for disabled and/or disadvantaged children of the United Kingdom

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £84

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 June 1984: Standard registration
  • 11 May 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 11 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1132249 FOWLER SMITH AND JONES TRUST
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE VICTORY TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £1.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £106 £50.08k £78 £81 £84
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 11 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 April 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 16 April 2021 381 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required