THE SIDNEY NOLAN TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust holds exhibitions of paintings and work of Sidney Nolan, supports the activity of artists and musicians through residencies, symposia, exhibition and recital, organises workshops and courses in arts related fields and advances the education of the public in the arts in general.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 12 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 1985: Standard registration
- 11 January 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 11 January 2020: Funds transferred to 1161850 THE SIDNEY NOLAN TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 12/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.51k | £103.03k | £128.19k | £108.08k | £122.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.01k | £147.97k | £184.61k | £129.28k | £356.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 12 June 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2017 | 05 February 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 01 February 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 03 February 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06/09/1985 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 18/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/08/2012
Charitable objects
THE MAIN OBJECTS OF THE TRUST HEREBY CREATED ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS GENERALLY (INCLUDING THE WORKS OF ART OF THE SETTLOR) AND IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) ESTABLISHING EQUIPPING MAINTAINING AND ENDOWING THE GALLERY WITH ANCILLARY FACILITIES FOR THE PURPOSE OF HOLDING EXHIBITIONS FOR THE PUBLIC (WITH OR WITHOUT CHARGE) OF WORKS OF ART BY THE SETTLOR OR SUCH OTHER ARTISTS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND (B) THE PRESENTATION FOR THE PUBLIC (WITH OR WITHOUT CHARGE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES) OF MUSIC DRAMA AND ANY OTHER RELATED ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window